OK SB514 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB514
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; creating a task force to study and make recommendations on school district operations. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; creating a task force to study and make recommendations on school district operations. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 34 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 34 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/10/2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-18 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2017-04-18 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | Emergency added |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 4 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Casey (principal House author) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Loveless |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB514 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 285 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 5 | 107C | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 7 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |