OK SB511 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB511
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans; designating the State Veterans Home of Sulphur to be a long-term cognitive care facility. Effective date.
Title
Veterans; designating the State Veterans Home of Sulphur to be a long-term cognitive care facility. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans & Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB511 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)