OK SB511 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Controlled dangerous substances; authorizing certain entities to engage in harm-reduction services; providing for registration and reporting. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled dangerous substances; authorizing certain entities to engage in harm-reduction services; providing for registration and reporting. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20SenateApproved by Governor 04/20/2021
2021-04-14SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-14HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-14SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-04-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Munson
2021-04-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Virgin
2021-04-13SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-04-13HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-13HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 23
2021-04-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McEntire
2021-04-13HouseGeneral Order
2021-03-31HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
2021-03-31HouseCR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2021-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-03SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
2021-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 18
2021-03-03SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2021-03-02SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Montgomery
2021-03-02SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 21
2021-03-02SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2021-02-09Senatecoauthored by Pae
2021-02-08SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2021-02-08SenateCoauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
2021-02-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Dossett (J.A.)
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2021-02-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Hicks
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Montgomery
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb511&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB511%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB511%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB511%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB511%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB511%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB511%20(2-11-21)%20(MONTGOMERY)%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB511%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB511%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB511%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB511_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB511_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback