OK SB510 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB510
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture associations and committees; Sorghum Resources Act; requiring unexpended balance in fund to transfer at certain date; modifying entity that designates referendum locations. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture associations and committees; Sorghum Resources Act; requiring unexpended balance in fund to transfer at certain date; modifying entity that designates referendum locations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-04-03 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Hilbert (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pederson |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB510 (Carry Over) 2017-04-11 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 18 | 241 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 242 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 243 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 244 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 245 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 246 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 247 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 249 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 250 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 251 | New Code | See Bill Text |