OK SB509 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-9)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Health insurance; requiring guidelines for step therapy protocol for certain health insurance plans. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; requiring guidelines for step therapy protocol for certain health insurance plans. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateApproved by Governor 04/16/2019
2019-04-11SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-11HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-11SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-10SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-10HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2019-04-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Hasenbeck
2019-04-10HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Dunnington, Roberts (Dustin), Mize, Bush, McEntire, Wallace, Echols, Blancett, Hilbert, Davis, Kannady, Conley, Miller, Caldwell (Trey), Dollens, Perryman, Bennett, Fetgatter, Frix, Dills, Lawson
2019-04-03HouseCR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-28SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2019-02-25SenateCoauthored by Representative Munson (principal House author)
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-14SenateCoauthored by Senator David
2019-02-14SenateCoauthored by Senator Rosino
2019-02-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Floyd
2019-02-11SenateCoauthored by Senator McCortney
2019-02-07SenateCoauthored by Senator Hicks
2019-02-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Daniels
2019-02-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Young
2019-02-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Simpson
2019-02-05SenateCoauthored by Senator Smalley
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-05SenateWithdrawn from Retirement and Insurance committee
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Rader
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback