OK SB508 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - SCs named Newhouse, Quinn, Montgomery, Stanley, Brooks, Matthews
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; requiring health insurers to respond to certain appeals of denied claims. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; requiring health insurers to respond to certain appeals of denied claims. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateSCs named Newhouse, Quinn, Montgomery, Stanley, Brooks, Matthews
2019-05-13HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
2019-05-08SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-22SenateHAs read
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2019-04-17HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Dills
2019-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-10HouseEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Insurance Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-28SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-11SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-11SenateReported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Newhouse
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback