OK SB505 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide Virtual Charter School Board; creating the Statewide Virtual Charter School Board Revolving Fund.
Title
Statewide Virtual Charter School Board; creating the Statewide Virtual Charter School Board Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 59 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 37 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 37 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/01/2015 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion expired |
2015-04-22 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nelson |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 32; Ayes: 59 Nays: 29 |
2015-04-22 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 54 Nays: 23 |
2015-04-20 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nelson |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 52 |
2015-04-20 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2015-04-20 | House | General Order |
2015-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |