OK SB502 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB502

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Environment and natural resources; providing Corporation Commission authority over certain highway remediation. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment and natural resources; providing Corporation Commission authority over certain highway remediation. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
2021-02-11SenateReported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Taylor
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB502 (Carry Over) 2021-03-01 - Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback