OK SB502 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; restricting use of investment or job creation tax credits by certain entities. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; restricting use of investment or job creation tax credits by certain entities. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Sen. John Ford [R] |
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] |
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/20/2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-18 | House | To Senate |
2015-05-18 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 5 |
2015-05-18 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jech |
2015-05-18 | House | CCR adopted |
2015-05-15 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-15 | Senate | coauthored by Bingman |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2015-05-12 | Senate | CCR read |
2015-05-04 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SCs named Quinn, Mazzei, Schulz, Marlatt, Bingman, Bass, Matthews |
2015-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2015-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3 |
2015-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Sanders |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | Title restored |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2015-02-25 | Senate | coauthored by Ford |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Mazzei |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Mazzei; authored by Quinn |
2015-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | coauthored by Brecheen, Allen |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |