OK SB501 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB501

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Smoking in an automobile with a minor; creating certain fine; requiring deposit of proceeds in certain fund; defining certain terms. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smoking in an automobile with a minor; creating certain fine; requiring deposit of proceeds in certain fund; defining certain terms. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-16SenateCoauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
2023-02-09SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Garvin
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB501 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback