OK SB50 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB50
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Guardians ad litem; certain responsibility of guardian ad litem. Effective date.
Title
Guardians ad litem; certain responsibility of guardian ad litem. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak |
2017-04-04 | House | General Order |
2017-03-28 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2017-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-16 | Senate | coauthored by Nollan (principal House author) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB50 (Carry Over) 2017-04-11 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2017