OK SB493 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB493

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Standard weights and measures; misrepresentation of prices and quantities; repealer. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standard weights and measures; misrepresentation of prices and quantities; repealer. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateApproved by Governor 05/31/2017
2017-05-24SenateSent to Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-23HouseTo Senate
2017-05-23HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2017-05-23HouseCCR adopted
2017-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2017-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6
2017-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2017-05-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Pederson
2017-05-18SenateCCR read
2017-05-11SenateSCs named Sharp, Boggs, Rader, Newhouse, Schulz, Sparks, Bass
2017-05-10HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2017-05-04SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2017-05-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Allen
2017-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Sparks
2017-04-25Senatecoauthored by Cockroft
2017-04-25SenateHAs read
2017-04-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 12
2017-04-24HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Quinn, Griffin, Boggs, Smalley
2017-04-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sanders, Osborn (Leslie), West (Rick), Kerbs, Renegar, Moore, Bennett (John), Fourkiller, Lepak, Casey, Loring, Perryman
2017-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2017-03-29HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2017-03-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 20
2017-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-02-21SenateCoauthored by Representative Coody (principal House author)
2017-02-21SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Sharp
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB493 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21438New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb493&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB493%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB493%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB493%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB493%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB493%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB493%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB493%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB493%20HFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB493_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB493_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback