OK SB493 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB493
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Standard weights and measures; misrepresentation of prices and quantities; repealer. Effective date.
Title
Standard weights and measures; misrepresentation of prices and quantities; repealer. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Brian Renegar [D] |
Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Rep. William Fourkiller [D] |
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Sen. Larry Boggs [R] | Rep. David Perryman [D] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] |
Rep. Ben Loring [D] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] | Rep. Rick West [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] |
Sen. Jason Smalley [R] | Sen. Roland Pederson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2017-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Sharp, Boggs, Rader, Newhouse, Schulz, Sparks, Bass |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sparks |
2017-04-25 | Senate | coauthored by Cockroft |
2017-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 12 |
2017-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Quinn, Griffin, Boggs, Smalley |
2017-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders, Osborn (Leslie), West (Rick), Kerbs, Renegar, Moore, Bennett (John), Fourkiller, Lepak, Casey, Loring, Perryman |
2017-04-24 | House | General Order |
2017-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 20 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Coody (principal House author) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB493 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017