OK SB493 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-16 - coauthored by Denney (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-16 - coauthored by Denney (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; modifying membership of the Economic Development Generating Excellence (EDGE) Fund Policy Board. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; modifying membership of the Economic Development Generating Excellence (EDGE) Fund Policy Board. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Jim Halligan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-16 | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) | |
2009-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-16 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Denney | |
2009-02-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Halligan | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb493&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb493_int.rtf |