OK SB478 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB478

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; creating the Health Care Choice Act; authorizes buying insurance across state lines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; creating the Health Care Choice Act; authorizes buying insurance across state lines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateApproved by Governor 05/31/2017
2017-05-24SenateSent to Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-23HouseTo Senate
2017-05-23HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
2017-05-23HouseCCR adopted
2017-05-18HouseCCR submitted
2017-05-18SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2017-05-18SenateCCR adopted
2017-05-17SenateCCR read
2017-05-11SenateSCs named Brown, Leewright, Griffin, Paxton, Dahm, Sparks, Matthews
2017-05-10HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
2017-05-08SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2017-05-01SenateHAs read
2017-05-01HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-27HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
2017-04-27HouseEnacting clause restored
2017-04-27HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseHouse Rule suspended
2017-04-27HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-12HouseEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-12HouseTitle restored
2017-04-12HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Brecheen
2017-04-12HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2017-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-27SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
2017-03-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-02-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
2017-02-13SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-02-13SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-13SenateReported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Brown
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB478 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb478&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB478%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB478%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB478%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB478%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB478%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB478%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB478%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB478%20HFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB478_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB478_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback