OK SB474 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax refunds; authorizing release of certain information; providing for donation to certain accounts. Effective date.
Title
Income tax refunds; authorizing release of certain information; providing for donation to certain accounts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Emily Virgin [D] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/11/2015 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Rescind rejection of House Amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2015-04-08 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 8 |
2015-04-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie), Sherrer |
2015-04-07 | House | General Order |
2015-03-26 | House | Title restored |
2015-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Virgin (principal House author) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |