OK SB47 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; competitive selection of vendors for issuing bonds for certain purpose; authorizing assistance of State Bond Advisor.
Title
Public finance; competitive selection of vendors for issuing bonds for certain purpose; authorizing assistance of State Bond Advisor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-09-25 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-09-25 | Senate | First Reading |