OK SB465 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle certificates of title; lien release; providing for a penalty. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicle certificates of title; lien release; providing for a penalty. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/01/2015 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-04-08 | House | Title restored |
2015-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | coauthored by Ownbey (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Quinn |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |