OK SB459 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fees for civil cases; modifying certain assessments. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees for civil cases; modifying certain assessments. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 54 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 48 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateApproved by Governor 06/04/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-22HouseTo Senate
2015-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 28
2015-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-21HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-21SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8
2015-05-21SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2015-05-20SenateCCR read, GCCA
2015-05-15HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2015-05-06SenateSCs named GCCA
2015-05-05SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-21SenateHAs read
2015-04-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 33
2015-04-20HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-08HouseTitle restored
2015-04-08HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Perryman
2015-04-08HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2015-03-17HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee sub-committee
2015-03-11HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
2015-03-10HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2015-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
2015-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-02-25Senatecoauthored by Grau (principal House author)
2015-02-23Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2015-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-18SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2015-02-11Senatecoauthored by Sharp
2015-02-11SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
2015-02-03SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Floyd
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb459&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB459%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB459%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB459%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB459%20SUBREC.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB459%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB459%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB459%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB459%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB459%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB459_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB459_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback