OK SB450 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB450

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; creating the Religious Viewpoints Antidiscrimination Act. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; creating the Religious Viewpoints Antidiscrimination Act. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary
2018-02-05HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
2017-03-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-02-21SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2017-02-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Bennett (John) (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB450 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7027201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7027208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback