OK SB447 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Coauthored by Ford
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Coauthored by Ford
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State government; providing for assistance for funeral expenses for certain persons. Effective date.
Title
State government; providing for assistance for funeral expenses for certain persons. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Newhouse [R] | Rep. Jay Steagall [R] | Rep. Ross Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Ford |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newhouse |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB447 (Carry Over) 2019-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author)