OK SB445 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB445

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax credit; allocation and calculation of caps for Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax credit; allocation and calculation of caps for Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16SenateApproved by Governor 05/16/2017
2017-05-10SenateSent to Governor
2017-05-10HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-10SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-09SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4
2017-05-09SenateHAs adopted
2017-04-26SenateHAs read
2017-04-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 23
2017-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-18HouseTitle restored
2017-04-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-04-06HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2017-03-28HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-01SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Standridge
2017-02-08Senatecoauthored by Calvey (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Newhouse
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB445 (Carry Over) 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
682357206New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb445&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB445%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB445%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB445%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB445%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB445%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB445%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB445%20HFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB445_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB445_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback