OK SB444 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB444
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
Pending: House Government Modernization and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
Pending: House Government Modernization and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State employee associations; statute relating to annual mailings to Department of Corrections employees. Emergency.
Title
State employee associations; statute relating to annual mailings to Department of Corrections employees. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 17 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 17 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Murphey (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB444 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Government Modernization