OK SB440 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB440
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; directing promulgation of rules to impose tetrahydrocannabinol (THC) potency limits; prohibiting sale of certain products. Effective date.
Title
Medical marijuana; directing promulgation of rules to impose tetrahydrocannabinol (THC) potency limits; prohibiting sale of certain products. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2023-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garvin |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB440 (Carry Over) 2023-04-13 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee