OK SB436 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating the Transportation Network Company Service Act.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating the Transportation Network Company Service Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 30 Nays: 11 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2015-05-05 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Quinn; authored by Shortey |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SCs named Quinn, Brown, Smalley, Simpson, Shortey, Wyrick, Sparks |
2015-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | House | Emergency not considered |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 20 |
2015-04-22 | House | Remove Representative Mulready as principal House author and substitute with Representative Echols |
2015-04-22 | House | General Order |
2015-04-07 | House | Emergency added |
2015-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Sharp |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Mulready (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Quinn |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |