OK SB432 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB432
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State Board of Career and Technology Education; allowing the establishment of a statewide aerospace training facility.
Title
State Board of Career and Technology Education; allowing the establishment of a statewide aerospace training facility.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Ryan Martinez [R] | Rep. Mike Osburn [R] | Rep. Nicole Miller [R] |
Rep. Garry Mize [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Miller |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mize |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rosino |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB432 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee