OK SB431 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB431
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; omnibus. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; omnibus. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brown [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/16/2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-24 | House | General Order |
2017-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2017-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB431 (Carry Over) 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 309 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 4101 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6903 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |