OK SB43 | 2022 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-27 - Conference granted, naming Special Session Conference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Public Safety; making an appropriation; providing lapse language.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Public Safety; making an appropriation; providing lapse language.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-27HouseConference granted, naming Special Session Conference Committee
2022-05-27SenateHAs rejected, conference requested, SCs named Treat, McCortney, Thompson, Hall, Floyd
2022-05-27SenateHAs read
2022-05-27HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2022-05-27HouseReferred for engrossment
2022-05-27HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 2
2022-05-27HouseEnacting clause stricken
2022-05-27HouseAmended
2022-05-27HouseGeneral Order
2022-05-26HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2022-05-20HouseFirst Reading
2022-05-20SenateEngrossed to House
2022-05-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2022-05-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4
2022-05-20SenateEmergency removed
2022-05-20SenateTitle stricken
2022-05-20SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2022-05-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
2022-05-19SenateDirect to Calendar
2022-05-18SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2022-05-18SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb43&Session=222X
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB43XX%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB43XX%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB43XX%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB43XX%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB43XX%20(5-19-22)%20(THOMPSON)%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB43XX%20FA1%20WALLACEKE-CC.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB43XX_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB43XX_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback