OK SB421 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB421
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child support; modifying guidelines for computation of income under certain circumstances; requiring modification of certain orders. Effective date.
Title
Child support; modifying guidelines for computation of income under certain circumstances; requiring modification of certain orders. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB421 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021