OK SB419 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB419
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health services; allowing certain licensing boards to develop certain policies and procedures. Effective date.
Title
Health services; allowing certain licensing boards to develop certain policies and procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | General Order |
2019-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB419 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2019