OK SB410 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB410

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: House Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans agencies; appointment and confirmation requirements for certain positions. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans agencies; appointment and confirmation requirements for certain positions. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
2017-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-21SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2017-03-20SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Hardin (principal House author)
2017-03-01SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-01SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2017-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Stanislawski
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB410 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7014103New CodeSee Bill Text
72633New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback