OK SB41 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety; modifying certain allowances and definitions in firearms act. Effective date.
Title
Public safety; modifying certain allowances and definitions in firearms act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Veto message read |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Vetoed 05/11/2015 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2015-05-04 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4 |
2015-04-22 | House | Amended |
2015-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught |
2015-04-22 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Calvey (principal House author) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fry |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1289 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1289 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |