OK SB408 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Discrimination; creating the Women's Bill of Rights; authorizing distinctions for certain purposes. Effective date.
Title
Discrimination; creating the Women's Bill of Rights; authorizing distinctions for certain purposes. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - House - House: Government Modernization and Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams |
2023-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Technology Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology |
2023-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Daniels |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Seifried |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garvin |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |