OK SB408 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Dentistry; modifying requirements; providing exclusions; modifying time elements. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dentistry; modifying requirements; providing exclusions; modifying time elements. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2021-02-01SenateRemove as author Senator McCortney; authored by Senator Garvin
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator McCortney
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback