OK SB407 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB407
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credits; modifying provisions of the Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act. Effective date.
Title
Income tax credits; modifying provisions of the Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] |
Rep. Ryan Martinez [R] | Rep. Chris Kannady [R] | Rep. Toni Hasenbeck [R] | Rep. Charles Ortega [R] |
Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 20 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Finance committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB407 (Carry Over) 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken