OK SB407 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; relating to continuing education; modifying requirements. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; relating to continuing education; modifying requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Died in conference | |
2011-05-11 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development | |
2011-05-09 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-04 | HAs read | |
2011-04-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-31 | General Order | |
2011-03-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | |
2011-03-08 | First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-07 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Mulready (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Brown | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |