OK SB404 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - coauthored by Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - coauthored by Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Career and technology education; creating the Oklahoma Career Promise Act; establishing eligibility criteria.
Title
Career and technology education; creating the Oklahoma Career Promise Act; establishing eligibility criteria.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-16 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |