OK SB397 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB397

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Bus Passenger Safety Act; removing certain prohibitions; making exception. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bus Passenger Safety Act; removing certain prohibitions; making exception. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateApproved by Governor 05/19/2017
2017-05-15SenateSent to Governor
2017-05-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-12SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-11SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1
2017-05-11SenateHAs adopted
2017-05-02SenateRemove as author Senator Loveless; authored by Senator Newhouse
2017-04-26SenateHAs read
2017-04-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 9
2017-04-25HouseEnacting clause restored
2017-04-25HouseTitle restored
2017-04-25HouseAmended
2017-04-25HouseHouse Rule suspended
2017-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-05HouseEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-05HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
2017-04-05HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Safety Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-27SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
2017-03-23SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2017-03-06Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Sean)
2017-03-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-27Senatecoauthored by Gann
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Faught
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Bennett (John)
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Coody
2017-02-16SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-16SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2017-02-09Senatecoauthored by Babinec (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Loveless
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB397 (Carry Over) 2017-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2017

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb397&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB397%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB397%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB397%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB397%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB397%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB397%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB397%20HFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB397_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB397_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback