OK SB395 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law Enforcement Retirement System; deleting reference to certain member positions. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Retirement System; deleting reference to certain member positions. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateApproved by Governor 06/04/2015
2015-05-20SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-19SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-19SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11
2015-05-19SenateHAs adopted
2015-04-14SenateHAs read
2015-04-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-13HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 13; Ayes: 83 Nays: 1
2015-04-13HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-01HouseEmergency added
2015-04-01HouseTitle restored
2015-04-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee
2015-03-10HouseSecond Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws
2015-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2015-03-03SenateEmergency clause stricken
2015-03-03SenateTitle stricken
2015-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-02-25Senatecoauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author)
2015-02-16SenateReported Do Pass Pensions committee; CR filed
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Pensions
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Mazzei
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
472300New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb395&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB395%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB395%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB395%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB395%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB395%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB395%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB395%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB395_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB395_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback