OK SB393 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Standridge
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

School curriculum; creating the Oklahoma Science Education Act. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School curriculum; creating the Oklahoma Science Education Act. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Standridge
2017-04-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Bennett (John)
2017-04-13HouseCR; Do Pass General Government Committee
2017-04-10HouseReferred to General Government Oversight and Accountability
2017-04-10HouseWithdrawn from Common Education Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-08SenateCoauthored by Representative Brumbaugh (principal House author)
2017-02-27SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7011103Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback