OK SB39 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB39
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State automobiles; modifying inclusions. Effective date.
Title
State automobiles; modifying inclusions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB39 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)