OK SB389 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cities and towns; cleaning and mowing of property; modifying exemption. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Cities and towns; cleaning and mowing of property; modifying exemption. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Holt [R] | Rep. Randon Grau [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb389&Session=1300 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2013-14bills/SB/sb389_int.rtf |