OK SB388 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB388
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home care; allowing certain individuals to assist with self-administration of certain medications. Effective date.
Title
Home care; allowing certain individuals to assist with self-administration of certain medications. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2019-04-22 | House | General Order |
2019-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator McCortney |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Remove as author Senator McCortney; authored by Senator Hall |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB388 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019