OK SB383 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Technology
Pending: House Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Censorship of social media; creating cause of action for censorship of certain speech. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Censorship of social media; creating cause of action for censorship of certain speech. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Technology
2021-03-15HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12
2021-03-11SenateTitle stricken
2021-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2021-03-02Senatecoauthored by McDugle
2021-02-25SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
2021-02-23SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2021-02-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Jett
2021-02-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb383&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB383%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB383%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB383%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB383%20(3-03-21)%20(STANDRIDGE)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB383%20FULLAMD1%20KEVIN%20WEST-JBH.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB383%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB383%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB383%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB383_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback