OK SB383 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; modifying provisions in the Oklahoma Health Spa Act relating to fees. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; modifying provisions in the Oklahoma Health Spa Act relating to fees. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-02 | First Reading | |
2009-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-02-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2009-02-26 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-16 | coauthored by Hickman (principal House author) | |
2009-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-10 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hickman | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Business and Labor | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Myers | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 2002 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2005 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2011 | New Code | See Bill Text |