OK SB381 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB381
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; allowing a school district board of education to amend certain policy to stock inhalers. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; allowing a school district board of education to amend certain policy to stock inhalers. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/23/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims |
2019-04-16 | House | General Order |
2019-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dollens (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB381 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019