OK SB379 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB379
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement mental health wellness; requiring certain training. Effective date.
Title
Law enforcement mental health wellness; requiring certain training. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB379 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety