OK SB377 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB377

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Electronic monitoring; sentencing powers of the courts; use of electronic monitoring of inmates. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic monitoring; sentencing powers of the courts; use of electronic monitoring of inmates. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateDied in GCCA
2017-05-11SenateSCs named GCCA
2017-05-10HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections
2017-05-04SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2017-04-26SenateHAs read
2017-04-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
2017-04-25HouseTitle stricken
2017-04-25HouseAmended
2017-04-25HouseEnacting clause restored
2017-04-25HouseTitle restored
2017-04-25HouseAmended
2017-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-12HouseEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-12HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections
2017-03-22HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-22SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
2017-03-21SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-08SenateCoauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
2017-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-01SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-02-09SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB377 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Died in conference

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224711New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb377&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB377%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB377%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB377%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB377%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB377%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB377%20SFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB377_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB377_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback