OK SB370 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB370

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Mines; updating regulations related to explosives. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mines; updating regulations related to explosives. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15SenateApproved by Governor 05/15/2017
2017-05-09SenateSent to Governor
2017-05-09HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-09SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-08SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 6
2017-05-08SenateHAs adopted
2017-04-18SenateHAs read
2017-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 20
2017-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-10HouseTitle restored
2017-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Rick) (principal House author)
2017-03-02SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-02SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB370 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb370&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB370%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB370%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB370%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB370%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB370%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB370%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB370%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB370%20SFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB370_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB370_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback