OK SB369 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Records of persons requiring treatment; authorizing inspection of certain records by certain persons. Effective date.
Title
Records of persons requiring treatment; authorizing inspection of certain records by certain persons. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/02/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-03-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2013-03-26 | House | General Order |
2013-03-19 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Sherrer (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ivester |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43A | 5 | 414 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 5 | 415 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 5 | 417 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 5 | 418 | New Code | See Bill Text |